Photography

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0767
    (SB0970)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0784
    (SB0523)
Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - DefinitionDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0849
    (SB0615)
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of ActionDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0947Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local JurisdictionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0523
    (HB0784)
Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - DefinitionSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0615
    (HB0849)
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of ActionSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0970
    (HB0767)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB1092Public Assistance Fraud Prevention ActSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.