Physician Assistants

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0459 / CH0099Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician AssistantsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0661 / CH0608Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death CertificatesDelegate MyersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1339
    (SB0807)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and ReportingDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0105 / CH0031Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing RequirementsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Finance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0807
    (HB1339)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and ReportingSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.