Physician Assistants

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0569Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician AssistantDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0591 / CH0442
    (SB0549 / CH0443)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation AgreementDelegate PlattApproved by the Governor - Chapter 442Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1299Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature RequirementDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0549 / CH0443
    (HB0591 / CH0442)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation AgreementSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:18 P.M.