Physicians

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0591 / CH0442
    (SB0549 / CH0443)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation AgreementDelegate PlattApproved by the Governor - Chapter 442Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0639
    (SB0731)
Health - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Post-Exposure ProphylaxisDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0681Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0839Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANSDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0857Health Occupations - Physicians - Specialty CertificationsDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0863 / CH0483
    (SB0698)
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and PracticeDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0909
    (SB0862)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0971Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement AllowanceDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB1008
    (SB1087)
State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular ProfessionalsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1063Physicians - Dispensing Permit Exemption - Prepackaged TopicalDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1193Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and EffectsDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1289Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder ScreeningsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1299Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature RequirementDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1335Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian ConsentDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1355
    (SB1067)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1424Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1473 / CH0527Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1582 / CH0407Human Services - Children Receiving Child Welfare Services - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring ProgramDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0449Public Health - Abortions - ViabilitySenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0549 / CH0443
    (HB0591 / CH0442)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation AgreementSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0731
    (HB0639)
Health - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Post-Exposure ProphylaxisSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0862
    (HB0909)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0871State Board of Physicians - Discipline for Alternative Treatments - ProhibitionSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1067
    (HB1355)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Senator ReadyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)
SB1087
    (HB1008)
State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular ProfessionalsSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1159Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service FacilitiesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)
SB1239 / CH0749
    (HB1613)
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Adverse Immigration ActionSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 749Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
4/9/2018 - 7:30 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:39 A.M.