Planning, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0252State Development Plan - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0409 / CH0521
    (SB0443)
Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0613 / CH0624Sustainable Communities - Designation and FinancingChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0706 / CH0384Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013Chair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 384Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1187
    (SB0887 / CH0572)
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic SystemsDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1247State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and CommissionDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1269
    (SB0240)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0240
    (HB1269)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0391
    (HB0106)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0443
    (HB0409 / CH0521)
Land Use - Local Governments - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CyclesSenator DysonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0671 / CH0520Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0887 / CH0572
    (HB1187)
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic SystemsSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0970Private Property Rights - Regulatory Infringement - CompensationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:44 A.M.