Planning, Department of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0462 / CH0010
    (SB0383)
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of FundsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0913
    (SB0366)
Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development ProjectsDelegate AumannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0366
    (HB0913)
Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development ProjectsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0608 / CH0225Employees' Pension System - Redeposit of ContributionsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 225Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.