Planning, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0131State Planning - Central DepositoryChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0417 / CH0366
    (SB0314 / CH0367)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0512The James Samuel Coleman Act of 2017Delegate HornbergerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1438
    (SB0896)
Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local FundsDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1449Baltimore City - Modifying or Closing Public School Facility - Review by Community Task ForceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0116 / CH0406Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of FundsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 406Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0896
    (HB1438)
Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local FundsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.