Plumbing

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0711
    (SB0643)
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas CodesDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1471
    (SB0831)
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and EnforcementDelegate VaughnIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1552Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)Environment and Transportation
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0643
    (HB0711)
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas CodesSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0831
    (HB1471)
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption and EnforcementSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.