Plumbing

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0207 / CH0050
    (SB0140 / CH0049)
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0246 / CH0254Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and FeesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0320Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0405
    (SB0461)
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - QualificationsDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0140 / CH0049
    (HB0207 / CH0050)
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0461
    (HB0405)
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - QualificationsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:43 P.M.