Podiatrists

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 2

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0104 / CH0474Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying ProvidersDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Health and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0109 / CH0048Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - RequiredChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.