Police Training Commission

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1056Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and AwarenessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1175 / CH0673
    (SB0721)
Police Training Commission - Membership - Police Chiefs' Association of Prince George's CountyDelegate VallarioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 673Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1178
    (SB0590)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Repeal of SunsetDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0590
    (HB1178)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Required Information and Extension of SunsetSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0721
    (HB1175 / CH0673)
Police Training Commission - Membership - Police Chiefs' Association of Prince George's CountySenator RamirezIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.