Political Candidates

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0073Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - RepealDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0323Election Law - Primary Elections - DatesDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0447Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference ExpensesDelegate HowardIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0515
    (SB0327)
Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0907Electronic Voting System Devices - Ballot ArrangementDelegate KachIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1044
    (SB0584)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1234Election of Circuit Court Judges - Random Ordering of NamesDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Elections (G1)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0294Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0327
    (HB0515)
Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0453Election Law and Ethics - Political Parties - Uniform Transparency, Disclosure, and Accountability ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0583Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0584
    (HB1044)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0729 / CH0310Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of ElectionCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB1065
    (HB1397)
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and EnforcementSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsEthics (G2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.