Political Candidates

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0053Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - RepealDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0112 / CH0252Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions ReceivedDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0156Election Law - Campaign Material - Clarification of DefinitionDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0174Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive ReliefDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0193
    (SB0151)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresBaltimore County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0200Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic MailDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0225
    (SB0261)
Election Law - Write-in CandidatesDelegate Howard, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0260 / CH0511
    (SB0554)
United States Senator, Attorney General, and Comptroller - Appointments and Special Elections to Fill a VacancyDelegate MoonAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 511Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0297Election Law - Business Entity Campaign Contributions - ProhibitionDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0444
    (SB0260)
Election Law - General Assembly Candidate Residency Form - RequirementDelegate Howard, C.In the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB0458
    (SB0380)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0937Public Service Commission - Commissioners - Selection and TermDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1063
    (SB0484)
Election Law - Filing Fee - Candidates for President and Vice PresidentDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1127 / CH0298Prince George's County - Dissemination of Voter Information Material - Multifamily Residential Structures PG 408-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 298Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1164Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial OfficeDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1201Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1230Election Law - Departmental Secretaries - Political ActivityDelegate TurnerIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1248
    (SB0428)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1559Elections - Nomination by Petition for Statewide Office - Required SignaturesDelegate Washington, A.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
HB1622
    (SB0760)
Municipalities - Municipal Elections - Regulations Governing Write-In CandidatesDelegate HixsonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsMunicipal Corporations (L3)
SB0151
    (HB0193)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0247Election Law - Certificate of Candidacy as Delegate to a Presidential National Convention - Place of FilingSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0260
    (HB0444)
Election Law - General Assembly Candidate Residency Form - RequirementSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0261
    (HB0225)
Election Law - Write-in CandidatesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0326Municipal Elections - Certificates of Candidacy - Proof of FilingSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsMunicipal Corporations (L3)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0380
    (HB0458)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0428
    (HB1248)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0484
    (HB1063)
Election Law - Filing Fee - Candidates for President and Vice PresidentSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0554
    (HB0260 / CH0511)
United States Senator, Attorney General, and Comptroller - Appointments to Fill a VacancySenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0760
    (HB1622)
Municipalities - Municipal Elections - Regulations Governing Write-In CandidatesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.