Political Candidates

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0087
    (SB0156)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0143 / CH0107Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and ProceduresChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0234Campaign Finance - Making a Contribution During General Assembly Session - ProhibitionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0303
    (SB0854)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0517
    (SB0358)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0529Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign FinanceChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0551Election Law - Private Loan to Campaign Finance Entity of Candidate - ProhibitedDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0594Landlord and Tenant - Candidate Signs and Proposition SignsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0619 / CH0285
    (SB0882 / CH0284)
Election Law - Campaign Signs at Polling PlacesDelegate HornbergerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 285Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0882
    (SB0805)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersDelegate KrimmIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationEthics (G2)
HB0898Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1006Elections - Public Official in Executive Unit - Elected Public OfficeDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1056Election Law - Court Offices - Nonpartisan ElectionsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Elections (G1)
HB1160Baltimore County - Judges - Nonpartisan Elections (Baltimore County Voting Rights Act)Delegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Elections (G1)
HB1363Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1382
    (SB1121)
Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary ElectionDelegate BarronIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Judicial ProceedingsElections (G1)
SB0130 / CH0282Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign PrincipalsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0156
    (HB0087)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0164Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning ApplicationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0358
    (HB0517)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0744Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0805
    (HB0882)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0832Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0854
    (HB0303)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0882 / CH0284
    (HB0619 / CH0285)
Election Law - Campaign Signs at Polling PlacesSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 284Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1023Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 2:02 P.M.