Political Candidates

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0053Election Law - Private Loan to Campaign Finance Entity of Candidate - ProhibitedDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0063Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of NamesDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0173Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 19-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0332Election Law - Use of Campaign Material Purchased Under the Authority of a Prior TreasurerDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0537Potomac Compact for Fair RepresentationDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0630 / CH0273
    (SB0289 / CH0272)
Frederick County – Ethics and Campaign Activity – Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License CommissionersFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0662
    (SB0256)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0768Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - DisclosureDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0785Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0981 / CH0834
    (SB0875 / CH0833)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1330Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political ConsultingDelegate McMillanIn the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1576Elections - Heads of State Governmental Units - Prohibition on Candidacy for Public OfficeDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1648
    (SB1035)
Declaration of Rights – Access to InformationDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB1703Election Law - Failure to File Campaign Finance Report or Affidavit - Injunctive ReliefDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
HB1805Election Law - Fund-Raising and Donations in Connection With a Campaign - Prohibition on FirearmsDelegate LaffertyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB0130Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0244Campaign Material – Social Media – Consent for Use of ImageSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0246State Personnel - Maryland Hatch ActSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0256
    (HB0662)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActSenator PinskyIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0289 / CH0272
    (HB0630 / CH0273)
Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License CommissionersSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 272Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationElections (G1)
SB0374Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0571 / CH0644Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0875 / CH0833
    (HB0981 / CH0834)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActSenator ZuckerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1035
    (HB1648)
Declaration of Rights - Right to InformationSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.