Political Committees

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0493
    (SB0673)
Referendum Integrity ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0620Campaign Finance - Contributions - DisclosureDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1044
    (SB0584)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1227General Assembly - Appointment to Vacancy in Office - ProcedureDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1524 / CH0691Election Law - Baltimore County Democratic Party Central Committee - MembershipBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 691Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1531 / CH0692Election Law - Prince George's County Republican Party Central Committee - MembershipDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 692Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0583Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0584
    (HB1044)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0673
    (HB0493)
Referendum Integrity ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0772Campaign Finance - Corporate Contributions and Independent Expenditures - Determination of Stockholder PreferenceSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB1056Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - DisclosureSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.