Political Committees

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0070Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means Elections (G1)
HB1022Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1479
    (SB0895 / CH0572)
Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of VacanciesDelegate FrankVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Elections (G1)
HB1513Harford County Republican Central Committee - MembershipHarford County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Elections (G1)
SB0319Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - ProceduresSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0895 / CH0572
    (HB1479)
Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of VacanciesMinority LeaderApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0930 / CH0074Election Law - Filing Deadlines for Pre-Primary Election and Post-General Election Campaign Finance ReportsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1043Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive StatusSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.