Political Parties

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0016Cecil County - Board of Elections - MembershipDelegate SmigielVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Elections (G1)
HB0418
    (SB0691)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1022Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1071
    (SB0645)
State Government - State Boards and Commissions - Appointments of Members of Nonprincipal Political PartiesDelegate IveyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1269Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1475Election Law - Signing a Petition - Required InformationDelegate BoboIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Elections (G1)
HB1479
    (SB0895 / CH0572)
Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of VacanciesDelegate FrankVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Elections (G1)
HB1513Harford County Republican Central Committee - MembershipHarford County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Elections (G1)
SB0243 / CH0047Cecil County - Board of Elections - MembershipCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0319Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - ProceduresSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0638Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License CommissionersSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0645
    (HB1071)
State Government - State Boards and Commissions - Appointments of Members of Nonprincipal Political PartiesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0691
    (HB0418)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0895 / CH0572
    (HB1479)
Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of VacanciesMinority LeaderApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1032Election Law - Political Party - Retention of StatusSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.