Political Parties

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing FundDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0087
    (SB0156)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0143 / CH0107Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and ProceduresChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0210
    (SB0129)
Anne Arundel County - Board of License CommissionersDelegate SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0303
    (SB0854)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0529Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign FinanceChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0622Potomac Compact for Fair RepresentationDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0707Election Law - Political Party - Retention of StatusDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0879 / CH0031
    (SB0683)
Public Integrity Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEthics (G2)
HB0898Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1056Election Law - Court Offices - Nonpartisan ElectionsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Elections (G1)
HB1160Baltimore County - Judges - Nonpartisan Elections (Baltimore County Voting Rights Act)Delegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Elections (G1)
HB1498Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and DisclosureDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0058Election Law - Election ObserversSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0064Voter Registration - Affiliating With a PartySenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0129
    (HB0210)
Anne Arundel County - Board of License CommissionersSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0156
    (HB0087)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0683
    (HB0879 / CH0031)
Public Integrity Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0744Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0832Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0854
    (HB0303)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1023Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2017 4:26 P.M.