Pollution

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0031
    (SB0057)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016Delegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0058 / CH0608Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and InspectionsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0061Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic DigestionChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0178Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and ProtectionDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0325Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Nutrient Credit PurchasesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0547Motor Vehicles - Tires, Exterior Lights, and Windshield Wipers - Biennial InspectionDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0599
    (SB0496)
Poultry Litter Management ActDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0610
    (SB0323 / CH0011)
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act - ReauthorizationDelegate BarveVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/26/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0635Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Recall or Remediation - Documentation of RepairsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0820
    (SB0398)
Reducing Environmental Degradation for the Underserved Through Community Engagement (The REDUCE Act)Delegate LamIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0848Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - ProhibitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0880Public Safety - Demolition Work - Safety Provisions and PermittingDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1070
    (SB0809)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertyDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1101 / CH0131Municipal Corporations - Closed Swimming Lake - Regulation MC 32-16Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 131Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1110
    (SB0645)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of FundsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1193
    (SB0067)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate PlattIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1346
    (SB0045)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0045
    (HB1346)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0057
    (HB0031)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0061 / CH0043Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and ClarificationsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0067
    (HB1193)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0125Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - ExemptionsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0323 / CH0011
    (HB0610)
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act - ReauthorizationSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
Environment (M3)
SB0398
    (HB0820)
Reducing Environmental Degradation for the Underserved Through Community Engagement (The REDUCE Act)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0496
    (HB0599)
Poultry Litter Management ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0645
    (HB1110)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of FundsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0719Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - MunicipalitiesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0809
    (HB1070)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SJ0001 / JR0001Patuxent River Watershed - Amendment of Patuxent River Policy PlanChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/1/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.