Pornography

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Criminal Law - Display of Material Harmful to Minors - RestrictionsDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0076 / CH0610Department of State Police - Investigation AuthorityChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0314 / CH0551
    (SB0346 / CH0550)
Peace Orders - Grounds for ReliefDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1375Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1456Public Schools - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0346 / CH0550
    (HB0314 / CH0551)
Peace Orders - Grounds for ReliefSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.