Pornography

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Family Law – Domestic Violence – Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0328
    (SB0121 / CH0501)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1134
    (SB0800)
Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an AnimalDelegate AtterbearyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HJ0005Exposure to Pornography - Public Health CrisisDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HJ0009
    (SJ0001)
Exposure of Minors to Pornography - Degradation of Public HealthDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0121 / CH0501
    (HB0328)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0585Devices Capable of Accessing Content on the Internet - Blocking Capability (Human Trafficking Prevention Act for Maryland)Senator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0769 / CH0365Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge PornSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0800
    (HB1134)
Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and SodomySenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SJ0001
    (HJ0009)
Exposure of Minors to Pornography - Degradation of Public HealthSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:24 P.M.