Ports

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0176Transportation Trust Fund Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1322Transportation Infrastructure BankDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0085 / CH0021Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port FacilitiesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0253Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0643
    (HB0524)
End the GridlockSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0829 / CH0422Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator MillerAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.