Postal Service

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018 / CH0270
    (SB0074 / CH0269)
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial InformationDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 270Appropriations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Higher Education (F2)
HB0060Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013Delegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0113
    (SB0225 / CH0147)
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - RegistrationDelegate HubbardVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0150
    (SB0694 / CH0328)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActDelegate ReznikVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0212Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased VotersDelegate AfzaliIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Elections (G1)
HB0288 / CH0393Transportation - Metropolitan Planning Organizations - Notice and Public HearingDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Environmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0489Municipalities - Incorporation Referendums - Special ElectionsDelegate SchulzIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
HB0559 / CH0345
    (SB0818 / CH0344)
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0875
    (SB0825)
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0912 / CH0242
    (SB0924)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacyDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0945Sewage Sludge - Permit Applications and Public Hearings - Notification RequirementsCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1221Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet CommunicationsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1261
    (SB0397)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Counties - Generally (L1)
HB1307 / CH0451Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of BenefitsDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1360Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - WarningDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1415 / CH0261
    (SB1017)
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeDelegate KaiserAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Elections (G1)
HB1462
    (SB0977 / CH0364)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices - Use of First-Class Mail Tracking MethodsDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1518Electric Companies - Notices Left at Customer Premises - Option to DeclineDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0015 / CH0467Election Law - Statewide Voter Registration List - Removal of Deceased VotersSenator JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 467Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0074 / CH0269
    (HB0018 / CH0270)
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial InformationSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 269Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0225 / CH0147
    (HB0113)
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - RegistrationSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0397
    (HB1261)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB0694 / CH0328
    (HB0150)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 328Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0818 / CH0344
    (HB0559 / CH0345)
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramSenator ForehandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0825
    (HB0875)
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0924
    (HB0912 / CH0242)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacySenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0977 / CH0364
    (HB1462)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices - Use of First-Class Mail Tracking MethodsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1017
    (HB1415 / CH0261)
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.