Postal Service

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0029Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate SchulzIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB0176Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 22-15Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0219Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and ReportingDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0226
    (SB0311)
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public CommunicationsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0255Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable AdultsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0306Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015Delegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0312
    (SB0077 / CH0008)
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing StatementsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0404
    (SB0279)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0561 / CH0433State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Notice of Member VacanciesDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Health and Government Operations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0660
    (SB0450 / CH0035)
Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for SubmissionDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0786 / CH0103
    (SB0613)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1019
    (SB0532)
Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1035 / CH0114
    (SB0439)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1064Election Law - Audits of Election ResultsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1068Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Nonresident CardholdersDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1076Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1093
    (SB0614)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1158Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of ExemptionsDelegate SteinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1208
    (SB0278)
Public Schools - Health and Safety - Food TransparencyDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1232
    (SB0851)
Real Property - Ground RentsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0143Health Care Malpractice Claims - Notice of IntentSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0197Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted BuildingsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsMunicipal Corporations (L3)
SB0278
    (HB1208)
Public Schools - Health and Safety - Food TransparencySenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Second Reading FailedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0279
    (HB0404)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0292Real Property - Land Records - Fraudulent RecordingsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0311
    (HB0226)
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public CommunicationsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0439
    (HB1035 / CH0114)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesSenator McFaddenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0450 / CH0035
    (HB0660)
Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for SubmissionSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0528
    (HB0360)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureSenator RaskinVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0532
    (HB1019)
Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0613
    (HB0786 / CH0103)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0614
    (HB1093)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0711Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for the Return of BallotsSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Senate Requests House RecedeEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0851
    (HB1232)
Real Property - Ground RentsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.