Pregnancy

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0007Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk ReductionDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0214Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0518 / CH0668Public Health - Prenatal HIV TestingDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 668Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0547Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0616 / CH0729
    (SB0232)
Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance PolicyDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 729Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0775 / CH0221
    (SB0600 / CH0222)
Public Health - Maternal Mental HealthDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0799Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1001
    (SB1015)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1167
    (SB0841)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1223Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and ExceptionsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1643Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for PregnancyDelegate LamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0232
    (HB0616 / CH0729)
Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance PolicySenator MannoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0600 / CH0222
    (HB0775 / CH0221)
Public Health - Maternal Mental HealthSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0841
    (HB1167)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1015
    (HB1001)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.