Pregnancy

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0086 / CH0432
    (SB0656 / CH0433)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels, Prediabetes, and Obesity TreatmentDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 432Health and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0748
    (SB0533)
Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law)Delegate KittlemanIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0775
    (SB0859 / CH0752)
State Employees - Parental LeaveDelegate KellyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0786
    (SB0539)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate Lewis, J.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0787 / CH0827
    (SB0629 / CH0828)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1038Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for PregnancyDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1109State Government - Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1271Family Law – Opioid–Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids – Mobile Application (I’m Alive Today App)Delegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1355
    (SB1067)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1424Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1437 / CH0528
    (SB1114 / CH0529)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1650Maryland Department of Health - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1685 / CH0558
    (SB0912 / CH0559)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Delegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1744 / CH0410Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - ReportingDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HJ0010Decreasing Surgical BirthsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0533
    (HB0748)
Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law)Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0539
    (HB0786)
Correctional Services – Restrictive Housing – LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0629 / CH0828
    (HB0787 / CH0827)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareSenator KelleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0656 / CH0433
    (HB0086 / CH0432)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels, Prediabetes, and Obesity TreatmentSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0859 / CH0752
    (HB0775)
State Employees – Parental LeaveSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 752Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0912 / CH0559
    (HB1685 / CH0558)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Senator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1067
    (HB1355)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Senator ReadyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)
SB1114 / CH0529
    (HB1437 / CH0528)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:00 P.M.