Pretrial Detention or Release

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0031
    (SB0412)
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0032Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - MinimumDelegate SchulzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0361Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceDelegate VallarioIn the House - First Reading JudiciaryJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0397Commercial Bail Data AnalysisDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0457Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or WitnessDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0494Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by SummonsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0496
    (SB0942)
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0596Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program CorporationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0618 / CH0442
    (SB0172)
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 442Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1009
    (SB0654 / CH0375)
Criminal Procedure - Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical EmergenciesDelegate SmithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0172
    (HB0618 / CH0442)
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesSenator GladdenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0412
    (HB0031)
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0654 / CH0375
    (HB1009)
Criminal Procedure - Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical EmergenciesSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0942
    (HB0496)
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.