Prisoners

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027Correctional Services - Child Pornography Offenders - Diminution Credits and ParoleDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0424
    (SB0786)
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0473Truth in Sentencing Task ForceDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0651
    (SB0478)
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - PenaltyDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0792 / CH0059
    (SB0507 / CH0058)
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child SupportWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0829Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint RestrictionsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0848
    (SB0454)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0921 / CH0652
    (SB0258)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0952
    (SB0782)
Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - Legal CounselDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1057
    (SB0865)
Correctional Services - Good Conduct Credits - Firearm Related CrimeDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1138
    (SB0778)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1192Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Use of a Firearm in Commission of a CrimeDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1242Correctional Services - Inmate Health Care Services - BillingDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1245
    (SB0822)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1350Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Reinvestment of Savings to Prisoner Reentry ProgramsDelegate McConkeyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0258
    (HB0921 / CH0652)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeSenator ShankVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0454
    (HB0848)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0478
    (HB0651)
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - PenaltySenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0507 / CH0058
    (HB0792 / CH0059)
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child SupportSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0778
    (HB1138)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0782
    (HB0952)
Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - ContractsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0786
    (HB0424)
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0822
    (HB1245)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0865
    (HB1057)
Correctional Services - Good Conduct Credits - Firearm Related CrimeSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.