Prisoners

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0038Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime - Diminution Credits and SentencingDelegate SchulzIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0121 / CH0490Criminal Procedure - Drug-Related Offenses - Departure From Mandatory Minimum SentencesDelegate AndersonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0301
    (SB0414)
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - ReportDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0303
    (SB0111)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0337
    (SB0366)
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as AdultsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0457Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or WitnessDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0622
    (SB0603)
Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Conditional ParoleDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0703 / CH0450Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - IncapacityDelegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0980
    (SB0340)
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-FelonsDelegate McCrayVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1000
    (SB0583 / CH0369)
DNA Evidence - Postconviction ReviewDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Third Reading Passed (123-15)Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1001Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Return of DefendantDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0111
    (HB0303)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0136Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime - Diminution Credits and SentencingSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0336Correctional Services - Elderly Inmates - Compassionate ReleaseSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0340
    (HB0980)
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-FelonsSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0366
    (HB0337)
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as AdultsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0414
    (HB0301)
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - ReportSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0419Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - IncapacitySenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0583 / CH0369
    (HB1000)
DNA Evidence - Postconviction ReviewSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0603
    (HB0622)
Correctional Services - Aging Prisoners - Conditional ParoleSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0874Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - Incarcerated EmployeesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledFinanceWorkers' Compensation (K1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.