Prisoners

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0882
    (SB0531)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0906
    (SB0433)
Correctional Services - Special Requirements for Elderly, Chronically Ill, and Terminally Ill InmatesDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1180 / CH0597
    (SB0946 / CH0596)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - ReportDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 597Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1195Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional EducationDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1305Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1447
    (SB0032)
State Government - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Prisoner of War MedalDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1501Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators ProgramDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1580Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0032
    (HB1447)
State Government - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Prisoner of War MedalSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0044Seat Belts - Operation of Motor Vehicle While Inmate or Person in Custody Unrestrained - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0121Criminal Procedure - Modification of SentencesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0433
    (HB0906)
Correctional Services - Special Requirements for Elderly, Chronically Ill, and Terminally Ill InmatesSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0531
    (HB0882)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0656Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0783Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment)Senator RosapepeIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0946 / CH0596
    (HB1180 / CH0597)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - ReportSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1111Correctional Services - Inmate Savings AccountsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.