Prisoners

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0081 / CH0666Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - ConfinementDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 666Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0445 / CH0201
    (SB0185 / CH0200)
Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related CrimesDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 201Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Health (J1)
HB0459 / CH0687Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and EducationDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Higher Education (F2)
HB0498 / CH0657
    (SB0562)
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified IndividualsDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 657Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0565 / CH0121
    (SB0372 / CH0122)
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph TestingCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0593 / CH0800
    (SB0348 / CH0799)
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of ErrorDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0723
    (SB0694)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformDelegate QueenIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0944
    (SB0469)
Correctional Services - Prison Artists Marketplace Program - EstablishmentDelegate Howard, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1001
    (SB1015)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1215
    (SB0983)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1233
    (SB0984)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release ProgramDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0185 / CH0200
    (HB0445 / CH0201)
Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related CrimesSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 200Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0243Correctional Services - Inmates - Financial Literacy TrainingSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)
SB0348 / CH0799
    (HB0593 / CH0800)
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of ErrorSenator KelleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0372 / CH0122
    (HB0565 / CH0121)
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph TestingCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0469
    (HB0944)
Correctional Services - Prison Artists Marketplace Program - EstablishmentSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0562
    (HB0498 / CH0657)
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified IndividualsSenator KelleyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0694
    (HB0723)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0983
    (HB1215)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0984
    (HB1233)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
SB1015
    (HB1001)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1119Correctional Services - Inmates - LaborSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
Finance
Public Safety (E4)
SB1129Substance Use Disorder Treatment - Licensing of Outpatient Programs and Provision of Naloxone KitsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.