Prisoners

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0100
    (SB0199)
Criminal Law - Violent Offenders - Penalties (Accountability for Violent Criminals Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0110 / CH0741St. Mary's County - Inmate Release ProgramsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 741Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0291 / CH0144
    (SB1137 / CH0145)
Correctional Services - Inmate Case Record - Educational, Vocational, and Job HistoryDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 144Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0295
    (SB1113)
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - EducationDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0373 / CH0608Cecil County - Home Detention and Release ProgramsCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0395
    (SB0423 / CH0602)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual InnocenceDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0542Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting RightsDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0628Correctional Services - Inmates - LaborDelegate WilkinsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0786
    (SB0539)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate Lewis, J.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0787
    (SB0629)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareDelegate DumaisIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0793Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Good ConductDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0797 / CH0254
    (SB0598 / CH0255)
Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene ProductsDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0846
    (SB0249)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0890Correctional Services - Parole Eligibility - Violent Crime Involving a FirearmDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0963Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Violent CrimeDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1082
    (SB0593)
Justice Reinvestment Act - ModificationsDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1160Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for WomenDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1225
    (SB0987)
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication is ReversedDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and TaxationJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1313Local Correctional Facilities - Prerelease and Work Release Programs - Assessment of FeesDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1723 / CH0625Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate EarningsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1733Local Correctional Facilities - Requirement for Prerelease ProgramsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1757
    (SB1124)
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention ProgramsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0199
    (HB0100)
Criminal Law - Violent Offenders - Penalties (Accountability for Violent Criminals Act of 2018)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0225Correctional Services – Eligibility for Parole – Life ImprisonmentSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0237Adult Correctional Institutions – Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Pilot ProgramSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0249
    (HB0846)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0423 / CH0602
    (HB0395)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual InnocenceSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0539
    (HB0786)
Correctional Services – Restrictive Housing – LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0593
    (HB1082)
Justice Reinvestment Act - ModificationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0598 / CH0255
    (HB0797 / CH0254)
Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene ProductsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 255Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0629
    (HB0787)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0637Correctional Services - Cecil County - Release and Home Detention ProgramsCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0987
    (HB1225)
State Finance and Procurement – Grant to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and ConfinedSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1113
    (HB0295)
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - EducationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1124
    (HB1757)
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention ProgramsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1137 / CH0145
    (HB0291 / CH0144)
Criminal Law - Prohibitions, Prosecutions, and CorrectionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 145Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:38 A.M.