Private Schools

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0172Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0221Local Government – School Construction – PermitsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0321
    (SB0003)
Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance RestrictionsDorchester County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0544
    (SB0369)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice PolicyDelegate RobinsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0622
    (SB0161)
Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – GuidelinesDelegate PattersonIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsWays and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0826
    (SB0503)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith StudioFrederick County DelegationIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0925
    (SB1055)
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Kent SchoolDelegate JacobsIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0932
    (SB0807)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Bnos Yisroel of BaltimoreDelegate RosenbergIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0936Institutions of Higher Education – Financial Aid Reductions – NoticeDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1002
    (SB1041)
Education - Teacher Certification - Montessori SchoolsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1005Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Takoma Park Cooperative Nursery SchoolDelegate WilkinsIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1103
    (SB0795)
Higher Education - Private Career Schools and For-Profit Institutions of Higher Education - RegulationDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1365Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones (Truth in Speed Cameras Act of 2018)Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1466Education - Video on Harms and Risks of Narcotic DrugsDelegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1565
    (SB1060)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionDelegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1571Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Employment ProcessDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1689
    (SB0685)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew AcademyDelegate MoralesIn the House - Rereferred to AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1702
    (SB1147)
Juveniles - Reportable OffensesWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1745
    (SB0689)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - St. Philip Neri Community HallDelegate SophocleusIn the House - Rereferred to AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0003
    (HB0321)
Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance RestrictionsSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0018Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Private Career SchoolsSenator WaughIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0043
    (HB0193)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and MeansFinance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0161
    (HB0622)
Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – GuidelinesSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0369
    (HB0544)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice PolicySenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0393Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Mother Seton AcademySenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0503
    (HB0826)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith StudioSenator HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0685
    (HB1689)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew AcademySenator MannoIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0689
    (HB1745)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - St. Philip Neri Community HallSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0725Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation - Civil Relief and School ResponseSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0795
    (HB1103)
Higher Education - Private Career Schools and For-Profit Institutions of Higher Education - RegulationSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0832Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bishop McNamara High School GymnasiumSenator CurrieIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1041
    (HB1002)
Education – Teacher Certification – Montessori SchoolsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1055
    (HB0925)
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Kent SchoolSenator HersheyIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1060
    (HB1565)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB1147
    (HB1702)
Juveniles – Reportable OffensesWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesJuvenile Law (E3)

February 23, 2018 5:10 P.M.