Process Serving

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0192
    (SB0156)
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program FundDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0866Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0968Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to RepossessDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1291
    (SB0554)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1340Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of ProcessDelegate StukesIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEnvironmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1427State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0156
    (HB0192)
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program FundSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0554
    (HB1291)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0846 / CH0325Courts - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of ProcessSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 325Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0891Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's EstateSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1001 / CH0079Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset ExtensionSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.