Process Serving

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0545Landlord-Tenant Action - Body Attachment - Prohibition (Jared Kushner Act)Delegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0942Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential TenancyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Real Property (N1)
HB1023 / CH0783
    (SB0861)
Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body AttachmentDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 783Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1081
    (SB1050)
Civil Actions – Body Attachment – ProceduresDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1329 / CH0646
    (SB1102 / CH0645)
Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of ProcessDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 646Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1646 / CH0251
    (SB1036)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1726Maryland Dentistry Act - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0442Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body AttachmentsSenator NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0578 / CH0424
    (HB0633 / CH0423)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 424Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0861
    (HB1023 / CH0783)
Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body AttachmentSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB1036
    (HB1646 / CH0251)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1050
    (HB1081)
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - ProceduresSenator SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1102 / CH0645
    (HB1329 / CH0646)
Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of ProcessSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 645Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:42 A.M.