Program Open Space

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0597
    (SB0867)
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 407-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0631
    (SB0357)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0675 / CH0448Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 448Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1091
    (SB0134)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0134
    (HB1091)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0171Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road PropertySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0357
    (HB0631)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0867
    (HB0597)
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf FieldsSenator PetersIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.