Prostitution

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0916 / CH0651
    (SB0791)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0943Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping and Prostitution - PenaltyDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1188
    (SB0215)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21Delegate ValderramaIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0215
    (HB1188)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21Senator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0654Criminal Law - Safe Harbor for Minors Act of 2013Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0791
    (HB0916 / CH0651)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceSenator KelleyIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.