Protection Orders

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0189Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against EmployeesSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0853
    (SB0417)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0892
    (SB0731)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1037
    (SB0630)
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective OrderDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1230
    (SB0490)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief and Orders to Vacate HomeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0417
    (HB0853)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0490
    (HB1230)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefSenator ShankIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0630
    (HB1037)
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective OrderSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0731
    (HB0892)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1001 / CH0079Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset ExtensionSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.