Protection Orders

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0044Family Law - Temporary and Final Protective Orders - Emergency Evaluation for Mental DisorderDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0060Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013Delegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0282Family Law - Peace Orders and Protective Orders - ShieldingDelegate CostaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0307 / CH0112
    (SB0333 / CH0111)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0309 / CH0114
    (SB0334 / CH0113)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0333
    (SB0028)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0352
    (SB0369 / CH0159)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent OffensesDelegate Valentino-SmithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0397 / CH0227Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Consent Orders - ShieldingDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0641 / CH0196
    (SB0803 / CH0195)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0647
    (SB0434 / CH0164)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - ExtensionsDelegate WaldstreicherVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0775
    (SB0041)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1182Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefDelegate GlassIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1186Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by SummonsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2014 - 3:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1221Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet CommunicationsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1278Family Law - Protective Order Proceedings - Jurisdiction - Custody of Minor ChildDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0028
    (HB0333)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0041
    (HB0775)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefSenator ShankIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0333 / CH0111
    (HB0307 / CH0112)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0334 / CH0113
    (HB0309 / CH0114)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0369 / CH0159
    (HB0352)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent OffensesSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0434 / CH0164
    (HB0647)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - ExtensionsSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0803 / CH0195
    (HB0641 / CH0196)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.