Protection Orders

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0599Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive ControlDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1189
    (SB0497)
Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Protective Order and Peace OrderDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1303 / CH0425
    (SB0491 / CH0426)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective OrdersDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1562Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Surrender of FirearmsDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
SB0491 / CH0426
    (HB1303 / CH0425)
Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective OrdersSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0497
    (HB1189)
Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Protective Order and Peace OrderSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0725 / CH0366Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School ResponseSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 9:24 A.M.