Psychiatrists

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0404
    (SB0418)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0579
    (SB0858)
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and YouthDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0885Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0944Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1103Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapyDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0418
    (HB0404)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0656Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0858
    (HB0579)
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and YouthSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB1081 / CH0241
    (HB1561)
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse PractitionersSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.