Psychologists

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0404
    (SB0418)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0579
    (SB0858)
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and YouthDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0657 / CH0273
    (SB0794 / CH0427)
Education - Prekindergarten and Kindergarten Assessments - AdministrationDelegate ShoemakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0885Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0944Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1016 / CH0519Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1103Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapyDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0418
    (HB0404)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0794 / CH0427
    (HB0657 / CH0273)
Education - Prekindergarten and Kindergarten Assessments - AdministrationSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0858
    (HB0579)
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and YouthSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB1026Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsPresidentIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.