Psychologists

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0190 / CH0671Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and EvaluationChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 671Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0902
    (SB1028 / CH0685)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Delegate CullisonIn the House - Favorable Report AdoptedHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1096 / CH0786State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success ProgramDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 786Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1289Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder ScreeningsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1359Criminal Procedure - Mental Health and Substance Abuse Offender Reentry Support ProgramDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Health (J1)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB1720Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and PoliciesDelegate PattersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0552 / CH0757
    (HB0742 / CH0756)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 757Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1028 / CH0685
    (HB0902)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Senator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 685Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.