Publications

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0019Higher Education - Sexual Assault Surveys and Sexual Assault Victim AdvocatesDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0046
    (SB0275)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0051Public Schools - Boards of Education - Bullying Hotlines and Tip BoxesDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0126
    (SB0723)
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed PublicationsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0244
    (SB0776)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0483State Government - Inspector GeneralDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0603
    (SB0490 / CH0174)
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage ProducersDelegate JamesonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0784
    (SB0732)
Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup GeneratorsDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0931
    (SB0530)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0951 / CH0625
    (SB0774)
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification RequirementsDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1119
    (SB0877)
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local LicensesDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1245
    (SB0922 / CH0205)
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic NotificationDelegate Valentino-SmithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1262
    (SB0633)
Maryland Education CreditDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0275
    (HB0046)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0490 / CH0174
    (HB0603)
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage ProducersSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0530
    (HB0931)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0633
    (HB1262)
Maryland Education CreditSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0723
    (HB0126)
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed PublicationsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0732
    (HB0784)
Income and Sales Tax Incentives - Emergency Preparedness EquipmentSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0774
    (HB0951 / CH0625)
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0776
    (HB0244)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0809Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0877
    (HB1119)
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local LicensesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0922 / CH0205
    (HB1245)
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic NotificationSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.