Publications

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0162
    (SB0611)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0381
    (SB0257)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0580 / CH0437
    (SB0198)
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended CoursesDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0596Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program CorporationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0659Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0849
    (SB0486)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Public School Holidays - References in Official Publications (Public School Holiday Protection Act)Delegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0853Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip ProgramsDelegate ArentzIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0943 / CH0141
    (SB0776)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0967
    (SB0725)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for SchoolsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1059
    (SB0686)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActDelegate Barnes, D.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1088Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending OrganizationsDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1255
    (SB0936)
Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for ViolationsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0198
    (HB0580 / CH0437)
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended CoursesSenator Nathan-PulliamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0257
    (HB0381)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0405Maryland Education CreditSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0486
    (HB0849)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Public School Holidays - References in Official Publications (Public School Holiday Protection Act)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0598Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNetChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0611
    (HB0162)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0616Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local LicensesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0686
    (HB1059)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0725
    (HB0967)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for SchoolsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0936
    (HB1255)
Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for ViolationsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.