Publications

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0104
    (SB0149)
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary DonationsDelegate RobinsonIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0184Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment PG 508-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0753 / CH0132Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice of Public Hearings on RegulationsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 132Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0766
    (SB0610)
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic ReviewDelegate HealeyIn the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0874
    (SB0892)
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and DutiesSpeakerIn the House - Returned PassedRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0981
    (SB0875)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1071Courts - Business and Technology CourtDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1386 / CH0032Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone NumberDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1540Health Care Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public NoticeDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1829Baltimore County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - EstablishmentDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0149
    (HB0104)
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary DonationsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0610
    (HB0766)
Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset PolicySenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0892
    (HB0874)
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and DutiesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0904Public Schools – Social Media Use by EducatorsSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2018 4:44 P.M.