Public Buildings and Facilities

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0076 / CH0319Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring SystemDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 319Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0251 / CH0435
    (SB0323)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0290 / CH0719
    (SB0536)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection SystemDelegate GrammerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 719Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0437 / CH0741
    (SB0202 / CH0742)
Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment FundsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 741Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationHigher Education (F2)
HB0441 / CH0594
    (SB0460)
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace PeriodDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0468Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Application to Leased PropertiesDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0656
    (SB0472)
Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees and Stormwater Charges - Property Subject to Fees and ChargesDelegate BarveIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and TaxationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
Environment (M3)
HB0664 / CH0033
    (SB0579 / CH0675)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsDelegate ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0717 / CH0143Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
HB0892 / CH0427
    (SB0736)
St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1043Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1185
    (SB0928)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1252County Boards of Education - Disposition of School PropertyDorchester County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1290State Government - Management of Public Buildings - Indoor Air QualityDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1439
    (SB0473 / CH0080)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1449Baltimore City - Modifying or Closing Public School Facility - Review by Community Task ForceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1509Maryland Healthy Vending Choices ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0202 / CH0742
    (HB0437 / CH0741)
Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment FundsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 742Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0323
    (HB0251 / CH0435)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0430State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0445Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0460
    (HB0441 / CH0594)
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace PeriodSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0472
    (HB0656)
Environment - Municipal Stormwater Charges - Property Subject to ChargesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Environment (M3)
SB0473 / CH0080
    (HB1439)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0536
    (HB0290 / CH0719)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection SystemSenator SallingIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0537Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program)Senator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0579 / CH0675
    (HB0664 / CH0033)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 675Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0736
    (HB0892 / CH0427)
St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0928
    (HB1185)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:52 A.M.