Public Buildings and Facilities

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0025
    (SB0045)
Creation of a State Debt – Prince George’s County – Eagle Harbor Town OfficeDelegate ProctorIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0141
    (SB0782)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsDelegate KnottsIn the House - Hearing canceledHealth and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0157State Highways - Electronic Map of Public Trash ReceptaclesDelegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0172Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0195
    (SB0473)
Prince George's County - School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018 PG 512-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0311
    (SB0400)
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve FundBaltimore City DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0331St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0483
    (SB0382)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Seat Pleasant City Hall and Public Works FacilitiesDelegate Lewis, J.In the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0952State Acquisition of the Fort Howard VA Campus PropertyDelegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0968
    (SB0092)
Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018Delegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0986
    (SB1009)
Department of General Services - Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird-Safe Buildings Act of 2018)Delegate LamIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1089
    (SB0894)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1098
    (SB0515)
Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment ActDelegate KormanIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1102Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise FundCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1321
    (SB0889)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsDelegate CordermanIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1354Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1472Maryland Stadium Authority - Use of State Owned or Leased Suite - DisclosureDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1724Gun-Free Higher Education ZonesDelegate JalisiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0045
    (HB0025)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Town OfficeSenator MillerIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0092
    (HB0968)
Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0382
    (HB0483)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Seat Pleasant City Hall and Public Works FacilitiesSenator BensonIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0400
    (HB0311)
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve FundSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0469Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program)Senator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0473
    (HB0195)
Prince George’s County – School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0515
    (HB1098)
Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment ActSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0782
    (HB0141)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0889
    (HB1321)
Washington County – Public Facilities BondsWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0894
    (HB1089)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1009
    (HB0986)
Department of General Services – Bird–Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird–Safe Buildings Act of 2018)Senator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB1064Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)

February 21, 2018 1:52 P.M.