Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0726
    (SB0384)
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research ProgramDelegate Turner, V.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0779
    (SB0368)
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency RequirementsDelegate TarrantIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0956
    (SB0719)
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to EmployersDelegate Turner, V.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0959
    (SB0676 / CH0304)
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of InformationDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1322Transportation Infrastructure BankDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1390 / CH0681Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - EstablishmentChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1418Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Bonding Authority and Reporting RequirementDelegate BranchIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1438
    (SB0962)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate RegulationDelegate JamesonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0368
    (HB0779)
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency RequirementsSenator PetersIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0384
    (HB0726)
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research ProgramSenator PughIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0591Governmental Procedures - Protection of Personal InformationSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0676 / CH0304
    (HB0959)
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of InformationSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0719
    (HB0956)
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to EmployersSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0743
    (HB0860 / CH0647)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Senator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and TaxationRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0844Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Addresses - Web Site NoticeSenator GettyIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0845Public Information Act - Required Denials - Electronic Mail AddressesSenator GettyIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0880Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Address - Database and DisclosureSenator GettyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0962
    (HB1438)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate RegulationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesWorkers' Compensation (K1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.